TN SB0209 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding child abuse; revises certain provisions regarding detention of juveniles. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding child abuse; revises certain provisions regarding detention of juveniles. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 36 and Title 37.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 510 | |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/29/19 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0509 (Crossfiled) 2019-06-06 - Pub. Ch. 510