TN SB0228 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that a student's gender for purposes of participation in a public middle school or high school interscholastic athletic activity or event be determined by the student's sex at the time of the student's birth, as indicated on the student's original birth certificate. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to school sports.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Effective date(s) 03/26/2021 | |
2021-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 40 | |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-03-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 71, Nays 16, PNV 5 |
2021-03-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0002) |
2021-03-22 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA0071) |
2021-03-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 6 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0020) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/1/2021 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0003 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 40