TN SB0235 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits any candidate for local public office who has not filed a required statement of interest or who owes civil penalties to the ethics commission from being able to qualify for election until the statement is filed or the civil penalties are paid. - Amends TCA Section 3-6-205 and Section 3-6-206.
Title
As introduced, prohibits any candidate for local public office who has not filed a required statement of interest or who owes civil penalties to the ethics commission from being able to qualify for election until the statement is filed or the civil penalties are paid. - Amends TCA Section 3-6-205 and Section 3-6-206.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1076 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee