TN SB0240 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 225
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows home school students to participate in extracurricular athletics if certain standards met. - Amends TCA Section 49-50-801 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, allows home school students to participate in extracurricular athletics if certain standards met. - Amends TCA Section 49-50-801 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-29HousePub. Ch. 225
2013-04-29HouseEffective date(s) 07/01/2013
2013-04-19HouseSigned by Governor.
2013-04-08HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-04-04HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-02HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-02HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-01HouseS. concurred in H. am. 1
2013-03-28HousePlaced on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/1/2013
2013-03-25HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 24
2013-03-25HouseH. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0173)
2013-03-25HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-03-07SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2013-03-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-03-04SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
2013-03-04SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0051)
2013-03-04SenateAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0032)
2013-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/4/2013
2013-03-01SenateS. Placed on cal. for 3/4/2013
2013-02-27SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2013-02-21SenatePlaced on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/27/2013
2013-02-20SenateAction Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 2/27/2013
2013-02-13SenatePlaced on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/20/2013
2013-01-31SenateP2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
2013-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-29SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0222 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 225

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback