TN SB0240 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the medical advisory committee, June 30, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the medical advisory committee, June 30, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 10
2015-03-09SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2015-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/9/2015
2015-03-04SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2015-02-25SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/4/2015
2015-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0377 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 10

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback