TN SB0240 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the governor to appoint persons to fill positions on certain boards from lists of nominees submitted by interested groups, instead of requiring appointments to be made from such lists. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 3 and Title 63, Chapter 23, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the governor to appoint persons to fill positions on certain boards from lists of nominees submitted by interested groups, instead of requiring appointments to be made from such lists. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 3 and Title 63, Chapter 23, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 211 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2017 | |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2017-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-30 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/8/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0817 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 211