TN SB0240 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that insurance pool, special fund, and reserve fund created by a governmental entity and any entity administering such funds be audited annually by the comptroller of the treasury. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-503 and Section 29-20-401.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 10-7-503 and Section 29-20-401, relative to audits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 337 | |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1049 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021