TN SB0246 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, subject to local approval, reduces size of board of mayor and aldermen from seven to five members beginning with the November 2016 election; authorizes the board to meet monthly at a time and place as prescribed by resolution of the board rather than meeting in accordance with a set schedule. - Amends Chapter 90 of the Private Acts of 1997, as amended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, subject to local approval, reduces size of board of mayor and aldermen from seven to five members beginning with the November 2016 election; authorizes the board to meet monthly at a time and place as prescribed by resolution of the board rather than meeting in accordance with a set schedule. - Amends Chapter 90 of the Private Acts of 1997, as amended.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-13SenateComp. became Pr. Ch. 4
2013-02-25SenateComp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
2013-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 2/25/2013
2013-01-31SenateP2C held on desk. Local Bill
2013-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-29SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0227 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-13 - Pr. Ch. 4

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback