TN SB0246 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the prevailing wage commission, June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the prevailing wage commission, June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-13 Pub. Ch. 64
2015-04-13 Effective date(s) 04/06/2015
2015-04-06SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-03-26SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-03-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-03-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-03-23HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
2015-03-23HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2015-03-16HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2015-03-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-03-12SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2015-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2015
2015-03-04SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2015-02-25SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/4/2015
2015-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0381 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 64

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback