TN SB0247 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires election officials to inspect filings for sufficiency and timeliness; establishes conclusive presumption that accepted filings are sufficient and timely filed. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, requires election officials to inspect filings for sufficiency and timeliness; establishes conclusive presumption that accepted filings are sufficient and timely filed. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on last calendar of 2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0225 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee