TN SB0249 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, over a three-year period, deletes requirement that 52 percent of the 5 percent commission retained by county registers for collecting and reporting recordation tax must be remitted to state treasurer and credited to state general fund. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-409.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, over a three-year period, deletes requirement that 52 percent of the 5 percent commission retained by county registers for collecting and reporting recordation tax must be remitted to state treasurer and credited to state general fund. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-409.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2020
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0229 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-06 - Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback