TN SB0249 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes up to two members of an LLC that owns property in a city to vote in the city's elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 2, relative to voting rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0209 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-10 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee