TN SB0250 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, rewrites provisions governing limited pilot project for certification of a training program offered by an EMT/AEMT training center; creates limited pilot project for purpose of determining the impact of such training centers. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, rewrites provisions governing limited pilot project for certification of a training program offered by an EMT/AEMT training center; creates limited pilot project for purpose of determining the impact of such training centers. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489 | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0228 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 489