TN SB0251 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, transfers the fire investigations section from the department of commerce and insurance to the bureau; revises and enacts related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Title
As enacted, transfers the fire investigations section from the department of commerce and insurance to the bureau; revises and enacts related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487 | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0174 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 487