TN SB0269 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing the sale of surplus property by an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing the sale of surplus property by an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 20.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413
2019-04-29SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/29/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0207 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 413

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback