TN SB0283 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes weekend and federal holiday driving restriction for antique motor vehicles and allows them to be used for general transportation any day of the week; provided, that they are not driven more than 5,000 miles annually. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, removes weekend and federal holiday driving restriction for antique motor vehicles and allows them to be used for general transportation any day of the week; provided, that they are not driven more than 5,000 miles annually. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0263 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-19 - Meeting Adjourned