TN SB0302 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates the Tennessee wine and grape board; establishes the powers and duties of the board; abolishes the viticulture advisory board; establishes certain requirements regarding use of funds received by the board. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 43; Title 57 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates the Tennessee wine and grape board; establishes the powers and duties of the board; abolishes the viticulture advisory board; establishes certain requirements regarding use of funds received by the board. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 43; Title 57 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 444
2019-04-30SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-17SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. 4/17/19
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-03SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1075 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 444

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback