TN SB0325 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 491
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing sales and use tax in regard to out-of-state dealers, - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 452 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing sales and use tax in regard to out-of-state dealers, - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 452 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 491
2019-05-02SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/2/2019
2019-05-01SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 5/2/2019
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019
2019-04-30SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-02SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee with negative recommendation
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-18SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Revenue Sub 3/19/19
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-02-05SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0326 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 491

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback