TN SB0354 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the statewide planning and policy council for the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities, June 30, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 33, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, extends the statewide planning and policy council for the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities, June 30, 2017. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 33, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Pub. Ch. 13 |
2013-03-13 | House | Effective date(s) 03/07/2013 |
2013-03-07 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-02-27 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-02-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-02-26 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-02-26 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-02-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0 |
2013-02-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/21/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/13/2013 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0754 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 13