TN SB0354 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, imposes a highway maintenance fee of 2.85 cents per mile driven by commercial motor vehicles in Tennessee; imposes a surcharge of 13 cents per gallon of diesel fuel used in freight motor vehicles driven in Tennessee; authorizes a franchise and excise tax credit in the amount of highway maintenance fees and surcharges paid by motor carriers domiciled in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 3; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, imposes a highway maintenance fee of 2.85 cents per mile driven by commercial motor vehicles in Tennessee; imposes a surcharge of 13 cents per gallon of diesel fuel used in freight motor vehicles driven in Tennessee; authorizes a franchise and excise tax credit in the amount of highway maintenance fees and surcharges paid by motor carriers domiciled in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 3; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/negative recommend |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means to next calendar |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0422 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0354&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0354.pdf |