TN SB0359 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires municipalities to record annexation resolutions and deannexation ordinances with the register of deeds in the county or counties affected by the boundary changes. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 51.
Title
As enacted, requires municipalities to record annexation resolutions and deannexation ordinances with the register of deeds in the county or counties affected by the boundary changes. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 51.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 120 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2019 | |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-03-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-02-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0362 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 120