TN SB0363 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to third calendar of 2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from 18 percent by volume to 24 percent by volume the alcohol content of wine that can be sold in grocery stores; changes the definition of wine for purposes of sales in grocery stores so that wine includes alcohol derived from wine that has added flavorings and additives. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases from 18 percent by volume to 24 percent by volume the alcohol content of wine that can be sold in grocery stores; changes the definition of wine for purposes of sales in grocery stores so that wine includes alcohol derived from wine that has added flavorings and additives. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to third calendar of 2020
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-05SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0975 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback