TN SB0389 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Pub. Ch. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Pub. Ch. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, "Joe 'Buddy' Bailey Memorial Bridge," State Route 227 in Wayne County.
Title
As enacted, "Joe 'Buddy' Bailey Memorial Bridge," State Route 227 in Wayne County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Pub. Ch. 82 | |
2009-05-12 | Effective date(s) 04/27/09 | |
2009-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-04-13 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-04-09 | S. concurred in H. am. 3 | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 04/09/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2009-04-02 | Am. no. 2 withdrawn. | |
2009-04-02 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA0114) | |
2009-04-02 | Am. no. 1 withdrawn. | |
2009-04-02 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-03-30 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-03-26 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-03-26 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-26 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0012) | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/26/2009 | |
2009-03-23 | S. Reset on cal. for 3-26-09 | |
2009-03-20 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/23/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 03/03/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 02/24/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0440 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 82