TN SB0389 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 399
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 399
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates Class A misdemeanor offenses regarding drawing and filing of deeds without actual ownership of property. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 66.
Title
As enacted, creates Class A misdemeanor offenses regarding drawing and filing of deeds without actual ownership of property. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 66.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Beavers (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Beavers (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Pub. Ch. 399 | |
2011-06-10 | Effective date(s) 06/06/11 | |
2011-06-06 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-31 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-21 | Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-21 | Am. no. 1 reconsidered, withdrawn. | |
2011-05-21 | Motion to reconsider adopted. | |
2011-05-21 | Motion to lift from table adopted. | |
2011-05-21 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-21 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0567) | |
2011-05-21 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-05-20 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-05-19 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-19 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 1 | |
2011-05-19 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0601) | |
2011-05-19 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0586) | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/16/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/19/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-07 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0948 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 399