TN SB0389 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies additional acts that would constitute unfair trade practices by insurers and allows the insured to bring a civil cause of action against an insurer for violations of certain unfair insurance practices. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, specifies additional acts that would constitute unfair trade practices by insurers and allows the insured to bring a civil cause of action against an insurer for violations of certain unfair insurance practices. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0453 (Crossfiled) 2016-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0389&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0389.pdf |