TN SB0389 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the county election commission to appoint the minimum number of election officials by at least 20 days before each election instead of 10 days before the election. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 5 and Title 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the county election commission to appoint the minimum number of election officials by at least 20 days before each election instead of 10 days before the election. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 5 and Title 8.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/17/2019
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-10SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0365 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback