TN SB0403 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 486
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 486
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a mandatory 30-day sentence for theft of a firearm; revises penalty for offense of failure to appear; revises other various provisions of criminal law. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, requires a mandatory 30-day sentence for theft of a firearm; revises penalty for offense of failure to appear; revises other various provisions of criminal law. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 486 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reset on next available calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0167 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 486