TN SB0408 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 355
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 355
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes property tax exemption for certain nonprofit entities that occupy and use real property owned by another tax-exempt institution; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-207 and Section 67-5-212.
Title
As enacted, authorizes property tax exemption for certain nonprofit entities that occupy and use real property owned by another tax-exempt institution; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-207 and Section 67-5-212.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 355 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0280 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 355