TN SB0411 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a voluntary photo identification electronic benefit card (EBT) program for the food stamp program; creates offense of trafficking in EBT cards. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50 and Title 71, Chapter 5, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a voluntary photo identification electronic benefit card (EBT) program for the food stamp program; creates offense of trafficking in EBT cards. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50 and Title 71, Chapter 5, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] | Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1220 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee