TN SB0411 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes, effective January 1, 2021, provision making it permissive for Shelby County to hold nonpartisan elections for state trial court judgeships and county judicial offices and requires elections for state trial court judgeships and county judicial offices to be conducted in a nonpartisan manner in Davidson and Shelby counties; requires the incumbent officeholder be listed first on the ballot if the incumbent qualifies for the election. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes, effective January 1, 2021, provision making it permissive for Shelby County to hold nonpartisan elections for state trial court judgeships and county judicial offices and requires elections for state trial court judgeships and county judicial offices to be conducted in a nonpartisan manner in Davidson and Shelby counties; requires the incumbent officeholder be listed first on the ballot if the incumbent qualifies for the election. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback