TN SB0446 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits local government entities from imposing greater restrictions or requirements on privately owned or operated sport shooting ranges than are applicable to any range located within the same unit of local government and owned or operated by a government entity. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As enacted, prohibits local government entities from imposing greater restrictions or requirements on privately owned or operated sport shooting ranges than are applicable to any range located within the same unit of local government and owned or operated by a government entity. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 223 | |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0187 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 223