TN SB0454 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes references and duties of the Tennessee Judicial Council, which terminated June 30, 2009. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 29; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, removes references and duties of the Tennessee Judicial Council, which terminated June 30, 2009. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 29; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 420
2019-04-29SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/29/2019
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-16SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/23/2019
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0395 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 420

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback