TN SB0472 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires court clerks to report the race, sex, and, if known, social security number of a person judicially committed or adjudicated a mental defective to the federal bureau of investigation-NICS index and the department of safety for use in determining a person's eligibility to purchase firearms; requires that such information be confidential. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 33 and Section 38-6-109.
Title
As enacted, requires court clerks to report the race, sex, and, if known, social security number of a person judicially committed or adjudicated a mental defective to the federal bureau of investigation-NICS index and the department of safety for use in determining a person's eligibility to purchase firearms; requires that such information be confidential. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 33 and Section 38-6-109.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 262 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0127) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0127) |
2019-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0677 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 262