TN SB0478 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits governmental entities from entering into confidentiality agreements with regard to public records. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, prohibits governmental entities from entering into confidentiality agreements with regard to public records. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0282) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0665 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee