TN SB0503 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires county election commissions to conduct a supplemental registration at public and private high schools once each fall and spring semester; authorizes high schools to provide opportunities for students to register to vote online at times other than the supplemental registrations. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires county election commissions to conduct a supplemental registration at public and private high schools once each fall and spring semester; authorizes high schools to provide opportunities for students to register to vote online at times other than the supplemental registrations. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0768 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback