TN SB0510 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Right to Shop Act." - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Right to Shop Act." - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 407 | |
2019-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2019; 01/01/2020 | |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-05-02 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 78, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Roberts, Akbari, Bailey) |
2019-04-30 | House | Conf. comm. appointed (Smith, C. Sexton, Daniel) |
2019-04-30 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1&3 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 3 for 4/30/19 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House Amendments #1 and #3. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0289) |
2019-04-30 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0229) |
2019-04-30 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0157) |
2019-04-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0314) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0159) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0419 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 407