TN SB0513 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of economic and community development to execute a separate agreement in conjunction with any capital grant contract awarded pursuant to provisions governing the state building commission for economic development purposes; deletes certain provisions regarding tax credits. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of economic and community development to execute a separate agreement in conjunction with any capital grant contract awarded pursuant to provisions governing the state building commission for economic development purposes; deletes certain provisions regarding tax credits. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1265 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 451