TN SB0527 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that a county judicial commissioner or magistrate may administer the oath of office to an elected or appointed official as authorized by a judge of the court or the county mayor. - Amends TCA Section 8-18-109.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that a county judicial commissioner or magistrate may administer the oath of office to an elected or appointed official as authorized by a judge of the court or the county mayor. - Amends TCA Section 8-18-109.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1147 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-19 - Failed in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback