TN SB0535 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates Reelfoot Lake as a Tennessee Heritage Site; authorizes commissioner to strategically market Reelfoot Lake for tourism development. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 22 and Title 11.
Title
As enacted, designates Reelfoot Lake as a Tennessee Heritage Site; authorizes commissioner to strategically market Reelfoot Lake for tourism development. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 22 and Title 11.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 443 | |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1067 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 443