TN SB0558 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing net earnings and net losses for purposes of the Excise Tax Law of 1999. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing net earnings and net losses for purposes of the Excise Tax Law of 1999. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Pub. Ch. 306 | |
2019-05-13 | Effective date(s) 05/08/2019 | |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0442) |
2019-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0267) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1028 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 306