TN SB0560 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes Williamson County to participate in a pilot project to use convenient voting centers upon approval by a supermajority of the county election commission for elections held in 2020 and thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, authorizes Williamson County to participate in a pilot project to use convenient voting centers upon approval by a supermajority of the county election commission for elections held in 2020 and thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1229 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee