TN SB0582 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, lowers the amount of revenue required from the sale of artwork from 90 percent to 80 percent in order for an art gallery that does not sell food or beverages to serve wine to patrons. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, lowers the amount of revenue required from the sale of artwork from 90 percent to 80 percent in order for an art gallery that does not sell food or beverages to serve wine to patrons. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1006 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Withdrawn.