TN SB0590 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a records custodian to petition a court for an injunction to prohibit a person from making records requests that constitute harassment. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 29.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a records custodian to petition a court for an injunction to prohibit a person from making records requests that constitute harassment. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 29.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/14/2020 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2020 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0626 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.