TN SB0597 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class C felony offense of communicating a threat of public harm; authorizes juvenile detention for juveniles communicating a threat of public harm. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
As introduced, creates the Class C felony offense of communicating a threat of public harm; authorizes juvenile detention for juveniles communicating a threat of public harm. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0972 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019