TN SB0604 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding alternative schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding alternative schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 465 | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/24/19 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0664 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 465