TN SB0624 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Facilitating Business Rapid Response to State Declared Disaster Act." - Amends TCA Title 58; Title 62; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Facilitating Business Rapid Response to State Declared Disaster Act." - Amends TCA Title 58; Title 62; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 378 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0175) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0175) |
2019-04-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0092) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0551 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 378