TN SB0625 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the Volunteer Public Education Trust Fund Act of 1985; designates the commissioner of education and state treasurer as trustees of the fund. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, revises the Volunteer Public Education Trust Fund Act of 1985; designates the commissioner of education and state treasurer as trustees of the fund. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 379 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0681 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379