TN SB0632 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, under the Long-Term Care Community Choices Act, the commissioner to recognize complex rehabilitation technology as a separate benefit category for the purposes of any proposed budget or other public documents, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires, under the Long-Term Care Community Choices Act, the commissioner to recognize complex rehabilitation technology as a separate benefit category for the purposes of any proposed budget or other public documents, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 96 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0080) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0647 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 96