TN SB0675 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the chief procurement officer to submit the annual report on the awarding of purchases to a minority-owned business, woman-owned business, service-disabled veteran-owned business, business owned by persons with disabilities, or small business to the general assembly in electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7, Chapter 4; Title 8, Chapter 37, Part 1; Title 12; Title 13, Chapter 29; Section 39-14-137; Title 49; Section 62-43-105 and Title 65, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the chief procurement officer to submit the annual report on the awarding of purchases to a minority-owned business, woman-owned business, service-disabled veteran-owned business, business owned by persons with disabilities, or small business to the general assembly in electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7, Chapter 4; Title 8, Chapter 37, Part 1; Title 12; Title 13, Chapter 29; Section 39-14-137; Title 49; Section 62-43-105 and Title 65, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2020 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1450 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee