TN SB0710 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies a technology services company that provides software or an application to connect retail licensees with consumers for the delivery of alcoholic beverages is required to have a delivery service license. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-224 and Section 57-3-225.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies a technology services company that provides software or an application to connect retail licensees with consumers for the delivery of alcoholic beverages is required to have a delivery service license. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-224 and Section 57-3-225.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0849 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-14 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback